CANTERBURY UMBRELLA

Charity number: 298480
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1720 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1720 days
Annual return 31 March 2015 Overdue Overdue by 2086 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Overdue Overdue by 2086 days
Annual return 31 March 2014 08 December 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 06 March 2015 34 days late
Annual return 31 March 2013 02 December 2013 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 02 December 2013 On time
Annual return 31 March 2012 03 December 2012 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 03 December 2012 On time