AURORA OPTIONS

Charity number: 299935
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time Download