Trustees CLYST ST GEORGE PARISH HALL
Charity number: 300797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isobel Stubbs | Chair | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Spencer | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lillian Kynaston | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Smith | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Donna Pagliero | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Claire Marks | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Cragg | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MANSER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL BRAGG | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.