Trustees VILLAGE HALL UPCHURCH
Charity number: 302873
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Stevens | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Boakes | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DORSETT | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jack Leech | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brynley Howells | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Groves | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Martin | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Lewin | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Tutt | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Geoffrey Steward | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ed Murphy | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.