ST EDMUND'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 02 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 03 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 17 June 2020 48 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 28 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 28 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 02 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 02 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 25 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 25 February 2017 On time Download