THE NORFOLK COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 304155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £305.24k £240.65k £232.20k £758.99k £311.28k
Total expenditure £303.45k £213.23k £208.49k £691.64k £324.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £21.43k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £228.86k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £503.87k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £909 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £3.93k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £577.15k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £114.49k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A