THE NORFOLK COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 304155
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicola Cubitt Trustee 05 September 2017 None on record
John Howling Trustee 19 June 2015 None on record
RAYMOND HOLLANDS Trustee None on record
Michael John Phelps Chair 02 December 2020 None on record
Marylyn Evans Trustee 23 September 2015 None on record
Philip Russell Wright Trustee 02 December 2020 None on record
Reuben Arnold Ritchie Trustee 09 September 2020 None on record
PAUL WEEKS Trustee
OLD CATTON SOCIETY Charity reporting is up to date
THE EARSHAM CHURCH TRUST (TOWN ESTATE) Charity reporting is up to date
OLD CATTON VILLAGE HALL Charity reporting is up to date
DANIEL ARTHUR GENTLE Trustee None on record
John Sweeney Trustee 05 September 2017 None on record
Louis Franklin Trustee 10 September 2019
EATON VALE SCOUT & GUIDE ACTIVITY CENTRE LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
Michael Richard Butler MBE, DL Trustee 06 January 2014
THE NORFOLK FREEMASONS CHARITABLE FUNDS Charity reporting is up to date
TRUST PROPERTY KNOWN AS THE PRIORY OF OUR LADY OF WALSINGHAM Charity reporting is up to date
THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH CHURCHES TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
NORWICH AREA SCOUT TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
MATTHEW BURRELL Trustee 17 October 2012
EATON VALE SCOUT & GUIDE ACTIVITY CENTRE LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
NORWICH AREA SCOUT TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Emily Fenton Trustee 05 September 2017 None on record