Accounts and annual returns COPDOCK AND WASHBROOK VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 13 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 13 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 14 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 August 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 11 August 2020 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 10 January 2020 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 23 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required