COPDOCK AND WASHBROOK VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £15.68k £18.21k £19.82k £25.97k £24.65k
Total expenditure £13.34k £18.40k £18.52k £24.59k £33.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k