Financial history 1ST WATCHET SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £26.84k £45.70k £55.59k £56.49k £66.43k
Total expenditure £25.10k £37.63k £48.30k £59.66k £59.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £20.82k £11.67k