2ND STONELEIGH (ST JOHNS) GROUP SCOUTS

Charity number: 305720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required