Governing document AECC UNIVERSITY COLLEGE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/03/1960 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 02/04/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND UNDERTAKE RESEARCH IN HEALTH SCIENCES, INCLUDING CHIROPRACTIC AND/OR OTHER ALLIED, RELATED OR ANCILLARY DISCIPLINES. (B) TO ESTABLISH TREATMENT CENTRES FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASE AND MAINTENANCE OF HEALTH BY THE APPLICATION OF ANY HEALTH SCIENCES DISCIPLINE, INCLUDING CHIROPRACTIC AND/OR OTHER ALLIED, RELATED OR ANCILLARY TREATMENTS. (C) TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH SCIENCES, INCLUDING CHIROPRACTIC AND/OR OTHER ALLIED, RELATED OR ANCILLARY DISCIPLINES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.