Accounts and annual returns MERCHANT TAYLORS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1063740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 04 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 12 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 26 September 2019 88 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 01 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window