Financial history THE WELLINGTON COLLEGE

Charity number: 309093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £57.45m £69.86m £66.53m £64.36m £53.14m
Total expenditure £48.11m £62.44m £63.54m £57.05m £54.10m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £40.00k £40.00k £40.00k £40.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.88m £3.17m £1.80m £6.80m £2.55m
Income - Other trading activities £4.92m £13.32m £9.02m £5.91m £4.86m
Income - Charitable activities £43.61m £49.85m £53.94m £50.51m £45.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £841.00k £1.21m £645.95k £1.15m £723.00k
Income - Other £3.20m £2.31m £1.13m £7.00k £0
Income - Legacies £103.00k £0 £15.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £44.66m £54.66m £63.44m £56.99m £54.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £257.00k £836.00k £102.60k £63.00k £20.00k
Expenditure - Governance £50.00k £49.00k £52.30k £90.00k £61.42k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £400.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £61.00k £712.00k £22.33k £51.00k £0
Expenditure - Other £3.19m £6.94m £0 £0 £0