Accounts and annual returns ST MARY'S SCHOOL (CALNE)

Charity number: 309482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 05 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 20 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 16 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window