THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (YORKSHIRE PROVINCE) TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1068103
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.00m £394.48k £462.47k £451.55k £778.96k
Total expenditure £546.49k £435.00k £598.54k £566.16k £1.10m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £63.96k N/A N/A N/A £117.16k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £664.68k N/A N/A N/A £356.66k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £272.30k N/A N/A N/A £305.15k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £471.24k N/A N/A N/A £1.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £52.65k
Expenditure - Governance £32.65k N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £209.85k N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £28.31k N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £561