THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (YORKSHIRE PROVINCE) TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1068103
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Jamie KIssack Trustee 15 September 2020
THE YORKSHIRE CONGREGATIONAL UNION (INCORPORATED) Received: On time
Rev Simon Keith Copley Trustee 01 January 2020
CENTRAL UNITED REFORMED CHURCH SHEFFIELD CHARITY Received: On time
THE YORKSHIRE CONGREGATIONAL UNION (INCORPORATED) Received: On time
STEPHEN GOODER Trustee 08 July 2013
LONGCAUSEWAY CHURCH (UNITED REFORMED AND METHODIST) Received: 19 days late
Batley Community Centre Received: On time
THE YORKSHIRE CONGREGATIONAL UNION (INCORPORATED) Received: On time
Rev ALAN GEOFFREY CRUMP Trustee 22 May 2018
THE YORKSHIRE CONGREGATIONAL UNION (INCORPORATED) Received: On time
Dr Christopher David Evans Trustee 09 March 2019
CONGREGATIONAL AND GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE YORKSHIRE CONGREGATIONAL UNION (INCORPORATED) Received: On time
JUSTIN MARK CHARLESWORTH Trustee 20 May 2015
BOLTON VILLAS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY Received: On time
THE YORKSHIRE CONGREGATIONAL UNION (INCORPORATED) Received: On time