Accounts and annual returns ST PETERS SCHOOL FUND SCARBOROUGH

Charity number: 1075832
Charity reporting is overdue by 176 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 176 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 176 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 November 2022 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required