BODY OF CHRIST INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES (BCIM)

Charity number: 1063805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £10.65k £11.98k £13.14k £9.54k £3.55k
Total expenditure £10.67k £11.88k £12.01k £9.32k £2.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A