Trustees GARD'NER MEMORIAL LIMITED
Charity number: 311872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Burnell | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kyla De Sousa | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Reynolds | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Routley | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Goodyear | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Nicholas Gosnell | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Graham Spawforth | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
GLENN VICTOR HANDLEY | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gary Michael Hay | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA EDWORTHY | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.