Financial history THE NATIONAL CENTRE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WITH EPILEPSY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 311877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £25.51m £25.23m £23.25m £25.31m £24.52m
Total expenditure £28.93m £23.64m £23.52m £25.80m £24.79m
Income from government contracts £23.34m £21.14m £21.71m £23.29m £22.43m
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £228.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.43m £3.03m £966.00k £1.19m £1.41m
Income - Other trading activities £688.00k £1.05m £350.00k £0 £682.00k
Income - Charitable activities £23.34m £21.14m £21.71m £23.29m £22.43m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £52.00k £12.00k £37.00k £31.00k £3.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £191.00k £801.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £1.87m £277.00k £22.00k £117.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £28.20m £23.10m £23.08m £25.37m £24.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £732.00k £541.00k £433.00k £431.00k £401.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £49.00k £19.00k £92.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0