Trustees OLD VICARAGE SCHOOL TRUST
Charity number: 312671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Jane Say | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Coakes | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kavita Patel | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN JAMES SKINGLEY | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CHARLES MASTERS | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
LUCY ALANNAH ROSEMARY BARNES | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Marina Brown | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christian Michael Heidl | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Kathryn Longstaff | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Maurice Waldman | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.