THE AMERICAN SCHOOL IN LONDON EDUCATIONAL TRUST LTD

Charity number: 312738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

26 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stacey McCall Towfighi Trustee 30 June 2016 None on record
ERIN ROTH Trustee 30 June 2015 None on record
SHERINE SAMIR LOUIS MAGAR Trustee 12 September 2017
SAWIRIS FOUNDATION Received: On time
James Darren Allaway Trustee 26 March 2021 None on record
Ogemdi Iloabuchi Umenyiora Trustee 26 January 2021 None on record
Christopher Anderson Trustee 31 July 2018 None on record
Nikos Stathopoulos Trustee 12 September 2017
BC Partners Foundation Received: On time
George Hatzmann Trustee 31 July 2018 None on record
Mark Edward Agne Trustee 01 September 2021 None on record
Alison Victoria Ferguson-Woods Trustee 01 September 2021 None on record
Cynthia Bake Trustee 28 January 2015 None on record
Daniel Hillel Rimer Trustee 26 January 2021 None on record
PRIYA HIRANANDANI VANDREVALA Trustee 07 December 2011 None on record
Robin Susan Appleby Trustee 12 September 2017 None on record
McKenzie Erin Webster Trustee 26 January 2021 None on record
Christopher Whitman Trustee 30 June 2015 None on record
DAVID NOVAK Chair 07 December 2011 None on record
Stephanie Roanne Schueppert Trustee 05 March 2018 None on record
Luca Bassi Trustee 05 March 2018 None on record
Rebecca Manuel Trustee 28 January 2015 None on record
Dr Hahnah Kasowski Seminara Trustee 31 July 2019 None on record
Liad Meidar Trustee 30 June 2015 None on record
Irene Zia Trustee 31 July 2019 None on record
Daniel Dwight Hajjar Trustee 12 September 2017 None on record
Russell Roth Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Kavi Vipul Thakrar Trustee 31 July 2019 None on record