THE DUCHESS OF LEEDS FOUNDATION FOR BOYS AND GIRLS

Charity number: 313103
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR HARRY SCROPE Trustee 01 August 2014 None on record
PHILIP ARTHUR NICHOLAS NOEL Chair 24 March 1998 None on record
REV GRAHAM PRESTON Trustee 13 November 2011
ROTHERHITHE CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES Charity reporting is up to date
AMICABLE SOCIETY'S SCHOOL Charity reporting is up to date
ALBION STREET COMMUNITY CHARITY LTD Charity reporting is up to date
Most Rev John Wilson Trustee 10 June 2019
THE BLUNDELL CHARITABLE FUND Charity reporting is up to date
SOUTHWARK TAYLOR EDUCATIONAL TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
DE SAMPAYO BEQUEST Charity reporting is up to date
WHITTINGHAM BEQUEST Charity reporting is up to date
THE DYMPNA CENTRE Charity reporting is up to date
THE VENERABLE ENGLISH COLLEGE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
WILLIAMS SOUTHWARK FUND Charity reporting is up to date
WEDGEWOOD ENDOWMENT ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK) Charity reporting is up to date
DUKE OF NORFOLK TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
ROBINSON BEQUEST Charity reporting is up to date
MATER ECCLESIAE COLLEGE Recently registered
THE ALLENBY ENDOWMENT IN CONNECTION WITH CRAYFORD R C SCHOOL Charity reporting is up to date
DUFFY BEQUEST Charity reporting is up to date
ST JOHN'S SEMINARY CIO Recently registered
CANON TIERNEY TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
HAYNES BEQUEST Charity reporting is up to date
HONORA TURNER O'CALLAGHAN SCHOLARSHIP FUND Charity reporting is up to date
ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK
CHARITY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESES OF SOUTHWARK AND ARUNDEL AND BRIGHTON Charity reporting is up to date
WOODROFFE BEQUEST ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK) Charity reporting is up to date
BUTLER TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
HOWARD OF GLOSSOP BEQUEST Charity reporting is up to date
REDMOND'S CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
DEPTFORD POOR FUND Charity reporting is up to date
MRS C J I B GORDON-CANNING'S PRIESTS' TRUST (LONDON) Charity reporting is up to date
MARGARET MARY WADDINGHAM Trustee 01 April 2009
THE CAMBRIDGE NAZARETH TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
JULIAN NICOLAS STOURTON Trustee 30 April 1997 None on record