HAKLUYT SOCIETY

Charity number: 313168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £152.21k £166.72k £188.57k £174.95k £183.93k
Total expenditure £157.97k £97.24k £130.27k £136.64k £104.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A