Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF YESHIVAT BNEI RE'EM

Charity number: 328666
Charity reporting is overdue by 56 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 56 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 56 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 02 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 02 August 2022 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 02 August 2022 459 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 25 December 2020 239 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 25 December 2020 239 days late Download Open in new window