Governing document KEYCHANGE CHARITY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 13 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED 29 JUNE 1999, 4 DECEMBER 2001 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 2006 as amended on 19 Nov 2008 as amended on 19 Nov 2008
Charitable objects
1.THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2.THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASONS OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY OR FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES. 3.THE PROMOTION BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CONSISTENT WITH THE NEW LIFE IN CHRIST JESUS OUR LORD OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL BASIS OF THE CHARITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.