Royal Academy Trust

Charity number: 1067270
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 July 2020 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 July 2020 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 14 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 14 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 09 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 29 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 29 March 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 31 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 31 March 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)