Governing document CARERS CENTRE SA LTD
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/04/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/08/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/08/2015 as amended on 09 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SERVICES AND SUPPORT TO CARERS, THEIR FAMILIES AND OTHER PEOPLE THEY CARE FOR. (BASED IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARKING AND DAGENHAM AND ADJOINING AREAS OR SUCH OTHER AREAS AS THE COMPANY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE)
Area of benefit
(BASED IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARKING AND DAGENHAM AND ADJOINING AREAS OR SUCH OTHER AREAS AS THE COMPANY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.