2ND ST MARTINS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1064119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.69k £7.41k £6.10k £6.00k £5.03k
Total expenditure £4.67k £8.37k £5.46k £8.26k £6.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A