Financial history The Tabernacle, Coulsdon Trust

Charity number: 1064627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £31.35k £28.72k £21.69k £2.40k £5.29k
Total expenditure £27.15k £34.23k £19.16k £4.24k £4.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A