Trustees LHA LONDON LTD

Charity number: 1069428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Conroy Chair 26 March 2019
None on record
Helen Wyeth Trustee 27 September 2022
None on record
David Sawer Trustee 27 September 2022
None on record
Harkamaljeet Sandhu Shinger Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record
Gareth Moody Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record
ADAM POOLE Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record
Shun Yu Bonnie Chiu Trustee 04 October 2019
360 GIVING
Received: On time
Niamat Ali Mohammed Trustee 04 October 2019
None on record
Peter Frackiewicz Trustee 26 March 2019
None on record
Petra Green Trustee 18 April 2018
None on record
SUE JOHNSON Trustee 16 September 2016
None on record
Alexandra Jane whiston-Dew Trustee 19 March 2015
None on record
Alexander McTavish Trustee 11 February 2014
None on record