FULMER EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1065512
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 June 2019 On time
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 July 2018 On time
Annual return 31 July 2016 04 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 04 May 2017 On time