FULMER EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1065512
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.85m £1.94m £2.33m £1.01m £1.17m
Total expenditure £1.40m £1.42m £2.48m £1.45m £2.00m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £11.94k £5.45k £35.17k
Income - Donations and legacies £532.79k £630.08k £676.27k £410.18k £186.10k
Income - Other trading activities £162.16k £27.44k £10.02k £10.02k £8.64k
Income - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.23m £1.62m £583.79k £955.30k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.86k £4.70k £2.72k £1.24k £1.60k
Income - Other £53.08k £49.46k £12.86k £3.88k £22.12k
Income - Legacies £0 £289.59k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.37m £1.39m £2.47m £1.44m £1.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £27.93k £9.18k £9.73k £8.74k
Expenditure - Governance £15.75k £8.68k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £5.25k £0 £0 £0 £884.72k