SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF SWINDON (WILTSHIRE)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities focus on the advancement of the Baha'i Faith and belief in the essential oneness of the world's revealed religions, and the Baha'i ideals of human brotherhood through various means including devotional meetings, childrens classes, youth activities, study sessions and interfaith involvement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 January 1998: Standard registration
- SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF SWINDON (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PEJMAN PAYMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fidelma Meehan | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Hamidi | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alla Borets | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kamran Ghasem Rashidi | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neda Hassan-Milne | Trustee | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
AFSOON PAYMANI | Trustee | 10 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAHBA BADII-AZANDAHI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PADRAIG GAFFNEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.10k | £4.24k | £2.85k | £2.13k | £2.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.03k | £4.51k | £3.26k | £1.92k | £2.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 December 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 5 DECEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BAHA'I FAITH AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THAT FAITH. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (WHETHER BAHA'I OR NOT) AND GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
SWINDON (WILTSHIRE) AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 RUTLAND GATE
LONDON
SW7 1PD
- Phone:
- 02075842566
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window