Trustees SURVIVE (SUPPORT FOR SURVIVORS OF RAPE AND SEXUAL ABUSE)
Charity number: 1069129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Morgan | Chair | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Raine | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
laura clare thomas | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joy Onyinyechi Ekpeh | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lionel Myers | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally King | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Suzanne Hodgson | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.