COMPASS SUPPORT SERVICES LIMITED

Charity number: 1068324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Francis Burrows Trustee 05 September 2019 None on record
James Walsh Trustee 23 March 2017 None on record
Daniel Robert Wakely Trustee 02 December 2020 None on record
Philip Peter Done Trustee 02 December 2020 None on record
Wendy Stokes Trustee 25 May 2017 None on record
Barbara Hedley Trustee 06 December 2018 None on record
Ian Lowe Trustee 06 September 2018 None on record
Kate Michelle Algate Trustee 02 December 2020 None on record
Pamela Liburd Trustee 10 July 2014 None on record