HOPE CHURCH ROTHERHAM

Charity number: 1069689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 June 2019 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 June 2019 124 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download