BE YOUR BEST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1077291
Charity is insolvent
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017
Total gross income £827.52k £838.63k £815.24k £882.53k £870.81k
Total expenditure £818.29k £827.61k £852.54k £865.23k £887.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £203.70k £0 £0
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £9.61k £21.46k
Income - Other trading activities £13.61k £44.79k £12.10k £49.88k £34.54k
Income - Charitable activities £813.91k £792.19k £803.14k £822.28k £814.81k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £1.66k £0 £760 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £796.98k £807.43k £837.71k £865.23k £887.40k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £21.31k £20.18k £14.84k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0