Accounts and annual returns AFRICAN ASSOCIATION OF LINGALA SPEAKERS

Charity number: 1099862
Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 303 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 303 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 February 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 February 2020 382 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required