BACK HOUSE HORSE WELFARE, ASSESSMENT AND THERAPY CENTRE

Charity number: 1076910
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 APRIL 1999. AS AMENDED ON 13TH JUNE 2002, AS AMENDED ON THE 26TH SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
1)TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF, REHABILITATION AND CARE OF AGED OR SICK HORSES AND PONIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF A SANCTUARY. 2) TO ADVISE AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ON MATTERS CONCERNING THE WELFARE OF HORSES AND PONIES.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 05 August 1999 : registered
  • 08 May 2014 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names
  • JIGSAW (Working name)
  • THE DOUGLAS FARM HORSE WELFARE, ASSESSMENT AND THERAPY CENTRE (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helped
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information