DURHAM CHRISTIAN PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1077549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 December 2020 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 December 2020 58 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time Download