CARERS TRUST LEA VALLEY CROSSROADS CARE SERVICE LIMITED

Charity number: 1075261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £699.45k £592.02k £630.60k £442.15k £501.60k
Total expenditure £629.99k £583.00k £545.73k £533.48k £568.13k
Income from government contracts £342.05k £342.05k N/A £42.03k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £200.58k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £16.95k £47.35k £155.98k N/A £10.05k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £565.99k £541.36k £472.87k N/A £489.35k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £2.88k £2.47k £1.54k N/A £2.20k
Income - Other £113.62k £839 £217 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £40.00k £150.00k N/A £6.61k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £629.99k £583.00k £545.73k N/A £568.13k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.57k £3.73k £4.72k N/A £2.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0