THE INDIGO TRUST

Charity number: 1075920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £203.34k £1.41m £1.04m £1.28m £4.40m
Total expenditure £885.38k £1.60m £1.65m £1.08m £4.18m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £937.50k £531.25k £937.50k £4.19m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £250.09k £229.31k £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £531.25k £0 £4.19m
Income - Investment N/A £220.94k £278.58k £202.72k £210.16k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £138.00k £2.00k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.56m £1.61m £1.04m £4.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £38.82k £40.26k £38.02k £26.75k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £6.88k £7.47k £7.70k £6.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £1.30m £1.25m £630.91k £3.81m
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £38.82k £40.26k £38.02k £26.75k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0