THE INDIGO TRUST

Charity number: 1075920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM JOHN PERRIN Trustee 16 January 2012
GOOD THINGS FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE INSTITUTE FOR PHILANTHROPY Received: On time
SAMEER DINKER PADANIA Trustee 03 August 2020 None on record
FRANCESCA ELIZABETH SAINSBURY PERRIN Trustee 27 April 1999 None on record
DOMINIC BRENDAN FLYNN Trustee 14 June 2007
THE THREE GUINEAS TRUST Received: On time
MENTAL HEALTH INNOVATIONS Received: On time
THE RVR CHARITABLE TRUST Overdue by 234 days
THE MICHAEL AND ANNA WIX CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE ARDWICK TRUST Received: On time
LE CORNU CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE TRUE COLOURS TRUST Received: On time
THE REST-HARROW TRUST Received: On time
PINHAS RUTENBERG EDUCATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
THE HELEN HARRIETT WILLIAMS CHARITY Recently registered
THE WOOLBEDING CHARITY Received: On time
Sonia Priya Sodha Trustee 23 December 2020 None on record