Financial history THE KINGHAM HILL TRUST

Charity number: 1076618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £10.68m £11.42m £12.74m £11.05m £13.51m
Total expenditure £11.11m £11.11m £11.48m £10.87m £12.74m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £258.00k £244.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.04m £922.00k £2.10m £1.04m £973.00k
Income - Other trading activities £1.16m £1.24m £1.16m £1.14m £1.46m
Income - Charitable activities £8.41m £9.15m £9.03m £8.46m £10.91m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £68.34k £113.00k £192.00k £167.00k £169.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £258.00k £244.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.02m £11.02m £11.33m £10.73m £12.58m
Expenditure - Raising funds £86.05k £92.00k £148.00k £140.00k £161.00k
Expenditure - Governance £73.43k £62.00k £99.00k £60.00k £104.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £42.39k £28.00k £31.00k £30.00k £30.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0