Accounts and annual returns THE SPIRES CENTRE

Charity number: 1076888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 26 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 26 July 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 12 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 12 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 17 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 27 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 17 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 17 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window