ST. MARY DE CASTRO CHALLENGE 900 CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1080547
Charity reporting is overdue by 232 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 232 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 232 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 04 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required