Trustees LINC THE LEUKAEMIA AND INTENSIVE CHEMOTHERAPY FUND
Charity number: 1078183

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Parker | Chair | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Bees | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Giles | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Wood | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joseph David Pointon | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ASHA JOHNY | Trustee | 21 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN BAMFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.