EDEN'S PROJECT

Charity number: 1078566
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 23 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 23 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 02 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 02 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 16 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 16 June 2017 On time Download